Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/21/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/22/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/03/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/12/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/19/2004
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/22/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/20/2004