Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/05/2004
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/21/2004
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/21/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/21/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/22/2004
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/24/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/08/2004