There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

State High Risk Pool Funding Extension Act of 2004

Short Titles as Introduced

State High Risk Pool Funding Extension Act of 2004

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to extend Federal funding for operation of State high risk health insurance pools.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/16/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S11386)
11/16/2004Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11386)
04/05/2004Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
12/01/2004HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/19/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/16/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
11/16/2004-8:54pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/16/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/16/2004SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S11386)
11/16/2004SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11386)
09/22/2004SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
04/05/2004SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions04/05/2004 Referred to
09/22/2004 Markup by
11/16/2004 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce11/16/2004 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health12/01/2004 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2283.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2283. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (11/16/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

State High Risk Pool Funding Extension Act of 2004 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize funds for States to create high risk health insurance pools and to operate existing State high risk pools. Amends the formula for appropriating funds to States to operate such pools to give one-half of the funds to eligible States equally and apportion the other half based on the number of uninsured individuals in each State and the number of enrollees in the State's qualified high risk pool. (Currently, all funds are allotted based solely on the number of uninsured individuals in the State.) Authorizes appropriations for the program through FY 2009.