Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law (01/08/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Temporary Extended Unemployment Compensation Act of 2002 (which is title II of the Job Creation and Worker Assistance Act of 2002, P.L. 107-147) to extend the temporary extended unemployment compensation (TEUC) program for five months, through weeks of unemployment ending before June 1, 2003 (currently January 1, 2003).

Provides for a transition period of continuing payments to individuals with amounts remaining in their TEUC account after May 31, 2003, for weeks beginning before August 30, 2003.