Text: S.23 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-1 (01/08/2003)

 
[108th Congress Public Law 1]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


[DOCID: f:publ001.108]

[[Page 117 STAT. 3]]

Public Law 108-1
108th Congress

                                 An Act


 
      To provide for a 5-month extension of the Temporary Extended 
 Unemployment Compensation Act of 2002 and for a transition period for 
   individuals receiving compensation when the program under such Act 
                ends. <<NOTE: Jan. 8, 2003 -  [S. 23]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. EXTENSION OF THE TEMPORARY EXTENDED UNEMPLOYMENT 
                              COMPENSATION ACT OF 2002.

    (a) In <<NOTE: 26 USC 3304 note.>> General.--Section 208 of the 
Temporary Extended Unemployment Compensation Act of 2002 (Public Law 
107-147; 116 Stat. 30) is amended to read as follows:

``SEC. 208. APPLICABILITY.

    ``(a) In General.--Except as provided in subsection (b), an 
agreement entered into under this title shall apply to weeks of 
unemployment--
            ``(1) beginning after the date on which such agreement is 
        entered into; and
            ``(2) ending before June 1, 2003.

    ``(b) Transition for Amount Remaining in Account.--
            ``(1) In general.--Subject to paragraphs (2) and (3), in the 
        case of an individual who has amounts remaining in an account 
        established under section 203 as of May 31, 2003, temporary 
        extended unemployment compensation shall continue to be payable 
        to such individual from such amounts for any week beginning 
        after such date for which the individual meets the eligibility 
        requirements of this title.
            ``(2) No augmentation after may 31, 2003.--If the account of 
        an individual is exhausted after May 31, 2003, then section 
        203(c) shall not apply and such account shall not be augmented 
        under such section, regardless of whether such individual's 
        State is in an extended benefit period (as determined under 
        paragraph (2) of such section).
            ``(3) Limitation.--No compensation shall be payable by 
        reason of paragraph (1) for any week beginning after August 30, 
        2003.''.

[[Page 117 STAT. 4]]

    (b) Effective <<NOTE: 26 USC 3304 note.>> Date.--The amendment made 
by this section shall take effect as if included in the enactment of the 
Temporary Extended Unemployment Compensation Act of 2002 (Public Law 
107-147; 116 Stat. 21).

    Approved January 8, 2003.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 23:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 149 (2003):
            Jan. 7, considered and passed Senate.
            Jan. 8, considered and passed House.

                                  <all>