Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 04/07/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/26/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/07/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/10/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/10/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/20/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/09/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/09/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/15/2004
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/23/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/19/2004
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 09/09/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/09/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/30/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 10/08/2004