Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 04/08/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/08/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 04/08/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/08/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/08/2004
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 04/08/2004
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 04/08/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 04/29/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/18/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/09/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/07/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/13/2004