Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 04/20/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 04/20/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 04/20/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 04/20/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 04/20/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 04/20/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/20/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/22/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 04/22/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/22/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/27/2004
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/03/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/03/2004
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/06/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/19/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/07/2004