Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 04/22/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/22/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/22/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 04/22/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 04/22/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/22/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 04/27/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/17/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/21/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/21/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/30/2004