Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/28/2004
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 04/28/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 04/28/2004
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 04/28/2004
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 04/28/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/28/2004
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 04/28/2004
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 04/28/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/28/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/10/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/10/2004
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/21/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/03/2004
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/22/2004