Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/29/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/10/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/10/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/10/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/10/2004
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/11/2004
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/12/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/13/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/17/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/20/2004
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/20/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/20/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/20/2004
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/20/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/21/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/01/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/01/2004
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/01/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/02/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/02/2004
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/02/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/02/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/02/2004
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/03/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/03/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/03/2004
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/03/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/03/2004
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/03/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 06/03/2004
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/03/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/03/2004
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/03/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/07/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/17/2004
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/21/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/22/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/24/2004
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/06/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/06/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/07/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 07/12/2004
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 09/07/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/08/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/29/2004