Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/05/2004
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/05/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/13/2004
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 05/19/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/14/2004
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/14/2004