Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/21/2004
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 09/09/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/09/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/09/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/09/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 09/09/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/09/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/09/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/30/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 09/30/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/30/2004
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/01/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/04/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 10/05/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/09/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 10/09/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 11/16/2004
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/16/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 11/16/2004
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 11/16/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/16/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 11/16/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 11/16/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 11/16/2004
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 11/16/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 11/16/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 11/16/2004
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 11/16/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/16/2004
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 11/16/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/16/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/16/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/18/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 11/18/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/18/2004
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 11/18/2004
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 11/19/2004