Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 01/29/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 01/29/2003
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/21/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/26/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/09/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 04/09/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/29/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/30/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/30/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 03/30/2004