Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/18/2004
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 05/18/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/18/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/01/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/01/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/01/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/03/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/07/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/17/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/23/2004