Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/19/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/20/2004
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 07/21/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/08/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/30/2004
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 10/07/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/11/2004