Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/31/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/18/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/10/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/10/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/22/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/24/2003
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 09/03/2003
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/14/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/04/2003