There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Chimayo Water Supply System and Espanola Filtration Facility Act of 2004

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Chimayo Water Supply System and Espanola Filtration Facility Act of 2004

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Chimayo Water Supply System and Espanola Filtration Facility Act of 2004

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Chimayo Water Supply System and Espanola Filtration Facility Act of 2004

Short Titles as Introduced

Chimayo Water Supply System and Espanola Filtration Facility Act of 2004

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to direct the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a feasibility study of a Chimayo water supply system, to provide for the planning, design, and construction of a water supply, reclamation, and filtration facility for Espanola, New Mexico, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/21/2004Became Public Law No: 108-354. (TXT | PDF)
10/21/2004Signed by President.
10/12/2004Presented to President.
10/07/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8350)
09/15/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9354-9356; text as passed Senate: CR S9354-9356)
08/25/2004Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/22/04 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 108-328.
06/08/2004Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
10/21/2004Became Public Law No: 108-354. (TXT | PDF)
10/21/2004Signed by President.
10/12/2004SenatePresented to President.
10/07/2004-1:18amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/07/2004-1:18amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8350)
10/07/2004-1:16amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2511.
10/07/2004-1:16amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8350-8351)
10/07/2004-1:16amHouseMr. Pombo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/20/2004HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Resources
09/17/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
09/17/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/17/2004-10:04amHouseReceived in the House.
09/15/2004SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9354-9356; text as passed Senate: CR S9354-9356)
08/25/2004SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 684.
08/25/2004SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/22/04 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 108-328.
07/14/2004SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/17/2004SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 108-668.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
06/08/2004SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6630-6631)
06/08/2004SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S6630)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/08/2004

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/08/2004 Referred to
07/14/2004 Markup by
08/25/2004 Reported by S. Rept. 108-328
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power06/17/2004 Hearings by
House Resources09/17/2004 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power09/20/2004 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2511.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.2511. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-354 (10/21/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on August 25, 2004. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Chimayo Water Supply System and Espanola Filtration Facility Act of 2004 - Title I: Chimayo Water Supply System - (Sec. 102) Directs the Secretary of the Interior to study the feasibility of constructing a water supply system that includes potable water transmission lines, pump stations, and storage reservoirs for the town of Chimayo, New Mexico, in the Santa Cruz River Valley in the eastern margin of the Espanola Basin (study area). Requires the Secretary to determine the total life cycle costs of the system and to consider: (1) operating the system in connection with the Espanola Water Filtration Facility; (2) various water sources for the Town; (3) reusing or recycling water from local or regional sources; and (4) using alternative water supplies. Sets the Federal share of the cost of the study at 75 percent.

Directs the Secretary to coordinate activities of the Bureau of Reclamation, the Bureau of Land Management (BLM), and the United States Geological Survey in furtherance of the study, including accessing BLM land adjacent to the study area and drilling exploratory wells on such land that are necessary to determine water resources available for the town.

(Sec. 103) Authorizes the Secretary to enter into contracts with water authorities in the study area to provide emergency water supply development assistance to any eligible person or entity, including for hauling water, installing water purification technology at community wells or individual point-of-use, drilling wells, installing pump stations and storage reservoirs, installing transmission and distribution pipelines to bring water to individual residential service connections, and the engineering, design, and installation of an emergency water supply system. Sets the Federal share of the cost of any such activity at 75 percent.

(Sec. 104) Authorizes appropriations, with a limitation on the use of funds for the construction of water infrastructure for the system.

Title II: Espanola Water Filtration Facility - (Sec. 202) Directs the Secretary, acting through the Commissioner of Reclamation, to provide financial assistance to the city of Espanola, New Mexico, for the construction of an Espanola water filtration facility to: (1) divert and fully use imported water to meet future demands in the region; and (2) use reclaimed water to enhance groundwater resources and surface water supplies. Authorizes the Secretary to provide financial assistance to the Santa Clara and San Juan Pueblos and non-Federal sponsors for the study, planning, design, and construction of a water delivery resource and infrastructure development as a component of the facility. Limits the Federal share of the cost of the facility or component to 25 percent. Prohibits the use of funds for the operation or maintenance of the facility or the component.

(Sec. 203) Authorizes appropriations.