Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/16/2004
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 06/16/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/17/2004
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/21/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/22/2004
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/24/2004