Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/30/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 01/30/2003
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 02/04/2003
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 02/05/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/05/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/11/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/12/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/13/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/24/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/26/2003
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/27/2003
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 02/27/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/03/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/18/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/24/2003
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/03/2003
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/28/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/30/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/07/2003
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 05/12/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/13/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/14/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/15/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/02/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/02/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 06/04/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/09/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/20/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/08/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/10/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/14/2003
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/14/2003
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 07/16/2003
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/21/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/23/2003
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 07/24/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 11/05/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 01/20/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/05/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 05/13/2004
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/18/2004