Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 06/16/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/16/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/18/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/18/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/22/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/22/2004
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/22/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/22/2004
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/22/2004
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/22/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/22/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/23/2004
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/24/2004
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/24/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/24/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 07/06/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/06/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/06/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 07/07/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/08/2004
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/08/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/08/2004