Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/11/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/24/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/04/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/04/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/28/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 06/13/2003