Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 06/23/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/23/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/23/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 06/23/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 06/23/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/23/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/23/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 06/23/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/24/2004
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/08/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/08/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/08/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/21/2004
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 07/22/2004