Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/09/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 07/09/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/16/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/16/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/19/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/20/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/21/2004
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 07/21/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/07/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/07/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/07/2004
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/07/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/08/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/13/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/15/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/21/2004
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/22/2004
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/28/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/28/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/28/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 09/28/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/28/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/28/2004
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/29/2004
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 09/29/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/30/2004
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/30/2004
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 09/30/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/30/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/01/2004
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/04/2004
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/05/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 10/08/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 11/16/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 11/16/2004
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 11/16/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 11/16/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/16/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/16/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 11/16/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/16/2004
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 11/16/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 11/16/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 11/16/2004
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 11/16/2004
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/16/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/16/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/16/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 11/16/2004
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 11/16/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/16/2004
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/16/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/16/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/18/2004
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/18/2004
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 11/18/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 11/18/2004
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 11/18/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 11/18/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 11/18/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/18/2004
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 11/18/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/18/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 11/18/2004
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 11/18/2004
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 11/19/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/19/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/19/2004
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 11/19/2004