Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 06/24/2004
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/15/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/19/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/19/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/07/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/07/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/09/2004
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/09/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/20/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/01/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/01/2004
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/01/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/01/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 10/01/2004
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/01/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/01/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/01/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/06/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/06/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/06/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/06/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/06/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/07/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/07/2004
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/07/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/07/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 10/07/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/08/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/16/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 11/16/2004
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/16/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/16/2004
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 11/16/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 11/16/2004