Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 06/24/2004
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 06/24/2004
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 06/24/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/25/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/12/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/13/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/13/2004
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 07/14/2004
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/14/2004
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/19/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/19/2004
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/21/2004
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/21/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/20/2004