Text: S.2618 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-448 (12/08/2004)

 
[108th Congress Public Law 448]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


<DOC>
[DOCID: f:publ448.108]


[[Page 118 STAT. 3467]]

Public Law 108-448
108th Congress

                                 An Act


 
 To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to extend medicare cost-
   sharing for the medicare part B premium for qualifying individuals 
      through September 2005. <<NOTE: Dec. 8, 2004 -  [S. 2618]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. EXTENSION OF MEDICARE COST-SHARING FOR THE MEDICARE 
                              PART B PREMIUM FOR QUALIFYING 
                              INDIVIDUALS.

    (a) In General.--Section 1902(a)(10)(E)(iv) of the Social Security 
Act (42 U.S.C. 1396a(a)(10)(E)(iv)) is amended by striking ``2004'' and 
inserting ``2005''.
    (b) Total Amount Available for Allocation.--Section 1933(g) of the 
Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 1396u-3(g)) is amended to read as 
follows:
    ``(g) Special Rules.--
            ``(1) In general.--With respect to each period described in 
        paragraph (2), a State shall select qualifying individuals, 
        subject to paragraph (3), and provide such individuals with 
        assistance, in accordance with the provisions of this section as 
        in effect with respect to calendar year 2003, except that for 
        such purpose--
                    ``(A) references in the preceding subsections of 
                this section to a year, whether fiscal or calendar, 
                shall be deemed to be references to such period; and
                    ``(B) the total allocation amount under subsection 
                (c) for such period shall be the amount described in 
                paragraph (2) for that period.
            ``(2) Periods and total allocation amounts described.--For 
        purposes of this subsection--
                    ``(A) for the period that begins on January 1, 2004, 
                and ends on September 30, 2004, the total allocation 
                amount is $300,000,000;
                    ``(B) for the period that begins on October 1, 2004, 
                and ends on December 31, 2004, the total allocation 
                amount is $100,000,000; and
                    ``(C) for the period that begins on January 1, 2005, 
                and ends on September 30, 2005, the total allocation 
                amount is $300,000,000.
            ``(3) Rules for periods that begin after january 1.--For any 
        specific period described in subparagraph (B) of paragraph (2), 
        the following applies:
                    ``(A) The specific period shall be treated as a 
                continuation of the immediately preceding period in that 
                calendar

[[Page 118 STAT. 3468]]

                year for purposes of applying subsection (b)(2) and 
                qualifying individuals who received assistance in the 
                last month of such immediately preceding period shall be 
                deemed to be selected for the specific period (without 
                the need to complete an application for assistance for 
                such period).
                    ``(B) The limit to be applied under subsection 
                (b)(3) for the specific period shall be the same as the 
                limit applied under such subsection for the immediately 
                preceding period.
                    ``(C) The ratio to be applied under subsection 
                (c)(2) for the specific period shall be the same as the 
                ratio applied under such subsection for the immediately 
                preceding period.''.

    Approved December 8, 2004.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 2618:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 150 (2004):
            Nov. 16, considered and passed Senate.
            Nov. 19, considered and passed House.

                                  <all>