Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 07/13/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/13/2004
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 07/13/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/14/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/14/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/20/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/06/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 11/16/2004
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 12/07/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/07/2004