Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 07/15/2004
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 07/15/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 07/15/2004
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 07/15/2004
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 07/15/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 07/15/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/20/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 07/21/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/22/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/07/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/07/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/13/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/30/2004