Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 01/30/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/13/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/03/2003
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/03/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/30/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/09/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/05/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/22/2003
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/02/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/29/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/14/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/21/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/29/2003