Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 07/22/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/27/2004
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 10/06/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/06/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 10/07/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 11/16/2004
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 11/16/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 11/16/2004
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 11/16/2004
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 11/19/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 12/07/2004