Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 02/04/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/04/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 02/04/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/04/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 02/04/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 02/04/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/04/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 02/13/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/13/2003
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/13/2003
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/14/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 03/04/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/11/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/24/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/01/2003
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 04/02/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 04/07/2003
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 04/11/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/21/2003
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/10/2003
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 07/09/2003
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 07/30/2003