Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 07/22/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/22/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 07/22/2004
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 07/22/2004
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 07/22/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 07/22/2004
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/22/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 07/22/2004
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 07/22/2004
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 07/22/2004
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 07/22/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/14/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/14/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/14/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/14/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/14/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/14/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/20/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/23/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/23/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 10/05/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/06/2004