Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 09/09/2004
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 09/09/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 09/09/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 09/09/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 09/09/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 09/09/2004
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 09/13/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/13/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/15/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/20/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/20/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/20/2004
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 09/20/2004
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/21/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/21/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/22/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/23/2004
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/23/2004