Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 09/10/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/24/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/30/2004
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/08/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/16/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 11/20/2004