Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 09/15/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 09/15/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 09/15/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 09/15/2004
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 09/15/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 09/15/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 09/15/2004
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/20/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/22/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/28/2004
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/28/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/06/2004
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 10/08/2004