Text: S.2873 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-455 (12/10/2004)




[108th Congress Public Law 455]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


<DOC>
[DOCID: f:publ455.108]


[[Page 118 STAT. 3628]]

Public Law 108-455
108th Congress

                                 An Act


 
  To extend the authority of the United States District Court for the 
        Southern District of Iowa to hold court in Rock Island, 
             Illinois. <<NOTE: Dec. 10, 2004 -  [S. 2873]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. HOLDING OF COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA.

    Section 11029 of the 21st Century Department of Justice 
Appropriations Authorization Act (28 U.S.C. 95 note; Public Law 107-273; 
116 Stat. 1836) is amended by striking ``July 1, 2005'' and inserting 
``July 1, 2006''.
SEC. 2. HOLDING OF COURT AT CLEVELAND, MISSISSIPPI.

    Section 104(a)(3) of title 28, United States Code, is amended in the 
second sentence by inserting ``and Cleveland'' after ``Clarksdale''.
SEC. 3. PLACE OF HOLDING COURT IN TEXARKANA, TEXAS, AND TEXARKANA, 
                    ARKANSAS.

    Sections 83(b)(1) and 124(c)(5) of title 28, United States Code, are 
each amended by inserting after ``held at Texarkana'' the following: ``, 
and may be held anywhere within the Federal courthouse in Texarkana that 
is located astride the State line between Texas and Arkansas''.
SEC. 4. PLACE OF HOLDING COURT IN THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW 
                    YORK.

    Section 112(a) of title 28, United States Code, is amended by 
striking ``and Watertown'' and inserting ``Watertown, and Plattsburgh''.

[[Page 118 STAT. 3629]]

SEC. 5. PLACE OF HOLDING COURT IN THE DISTRICT OF COLORADO.

    Section 85 of title 28, United States Code, is amended by inserting 
``Colorado Springs,'' after ``Boulder,''.

    Approved December 10, 2004.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 2873:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 150 (2004):
            Nov. 19, considered and passed Senate.
            Nov. 20, considered and passed House.

                                  <all>