Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 10/05/2004
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 10/08/2004
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 10/08/2004
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/08/2004
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/08/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 10/08/2004
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 10/08/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/08/2004
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 10/08/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/08/2004
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 10/08/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 10/08/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 10/08/2004
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 11/16/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/16/2004
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 11/16/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/16/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 11/16/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/16/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/16/2004
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 11/16/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 11/16/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/16/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/16/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 11/16/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 11/16/2004
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 11/16/2004
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 11/18/2004
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/18/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/18/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/18/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/18/2004
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 11/18/2004
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 11/18/2004
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 11/18/2004
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/18/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 11/18/2004
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/18/2004
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 11/18/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 11/18/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/18/2004
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/18/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/18/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/18/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 11/19/2004
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 11/19/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 11/19/2004
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/19/2004
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 11/19/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 11/19/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 11/19/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/19/2004
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 11/19/2004
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 11/19/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 11/19/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 11/19/2004
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 11/19/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 11/19/2004
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 11/19/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 11/20/2004
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 11/20/2004
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 11/20/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/20/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 11/20/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/20/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 11/20/2004
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 11/20/2004
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/20/2004
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 12/08/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 12/08/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 12/08/2004