Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 02/14/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 02/14/2003
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/14/2003
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 02/14/2003
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 02/24/2003
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/24/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/24/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 02/25/2003
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/03/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/07/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/11/2003