Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 02/05/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/05/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 02/05/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 02/05/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/05/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/05/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/05/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/05/2003
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 02/05/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/05/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/05/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/05/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/05/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/05/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/10/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 02/10/2003
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 02/25/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/03/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/29/2003