There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans' Memorial Preservation and Recognition Act of 2003

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans' Memorial Preservation and Recognition Act of 2003

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans' Memorial Preservation and Recognition Act of 2003

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Veterans' Memorial Preservation and Recognition Act of 2003

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Memorial Preservation and Recognition Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to further the protection and recognition of veterans' memorials, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
05/29/2003Became Public Law No: 108-29. (TXT | PDF)
05/29/2003Signed by President.
05/22/2003Presented to President.
05/20/2003Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 0 (Roll no. 196).(text: CR H4263)
05/19/2003Committee on Transportation discharged.
05/19/2003Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 108-112, Part I.
03/27/2003Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4539; text: CR S4539)
03/20/2003Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Hatch without amendment. Without written report.
02/06/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (29)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/29/2003Became Public Law No: 108-29. (TXT | PDF)
05/29/2003Signed by President.
05/22/2003SenatePresented to President.
05/20/2003-1:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/20/2003-1:07pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 0 (Roll no. 196). (text: CR H4263)
05/20/2003-12:59pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4286)
05/20/2003-10:15amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/20/2003-10:10amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 330.
05/20/2003-10:10amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4263-4264)
05/20/2003-10:10amHouseMr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/19/2003HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 58.
05/19/2003HouseCommittee on Transportation discharged.
05/19/2003HouseHouse Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than May 19, 2003.
05/19/2003HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 108-112, Part I.
05/07/2003HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/07/2003HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/01/2003HouseSubcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
04/28/2003HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/31/2003HouseReferred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
03/31/2003HouseReferred to House Judiciary
03/31/2003HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/31/2003SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/31/2003-1:55pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/27/2003SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4539; text: CR S4539)
03/20/2003SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 44.
03/20/2003SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Hatch without amendment. Without written report.
03/20/2003SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/06/2003SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2055)
02/06/2003SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5254-5255)

Cosponsors (28)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary02/06/2003 Referred to
03/20/2003 Markup by
03/20/2003 Reported by
House Judiciary03/31/2003 Referred to
05/07/2003 Markup by
05/19/2003 Reported by H. Rept. 108-112
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security04/28/2003 Referred to
05/01/2003 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/31/2003 Referred to
05/19/2003 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.330. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-29 (05/29/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Veterans' Memorial Preservation and Recognition Act of 2003 - Establishes criminal penalties for willfully injuring or destroying or attempting to injure or destroy any structure, plaque, statue, or other monument on public property commemorating the service of any person(s) in the U.S. armed forces.

Requires that veterans cemeteries be treated as sites permitting supplemental guide signs on Federal-aid highways.