Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/10/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/10/2003
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 02/10/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 02/10/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/10/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/10/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 02/10/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/10/2003
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 02/10/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 02/10/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/10/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 02/10/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 02/10/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 02/10/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 02/10/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/10/2003
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 02/12/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/13/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/26/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/26/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/26/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/20/2003
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/22/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/03/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/18/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/08/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/16/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/23/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/11/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/30/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/01/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 10/21/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/09/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 02/23/2004
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/02/2004
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/08/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/25/2004
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/20/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/18/2004
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/21/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/21/2004
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/07/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/20/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/22/2004