Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/26/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 02/27/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/27/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/06/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/06/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/07/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/10/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/13/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/13/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/18/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/20/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/20/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/25/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/31/2003
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/29/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/29/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/29/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/07/2003