Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/11/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/27/2003
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/17/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/12/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 12/09/2003
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 04/21/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/24/2004