Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 02/24/2003
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/25/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/25/2003
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 02/26/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/27/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 02/27/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/27/2003
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 03/05/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/12/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 03/24/2003
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/24/2003
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/24/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/24/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/31/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/31/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/10/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/28/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/28/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/29/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/29/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/01/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 06/02/2003
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 06/02/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/03/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/03/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/04/2003
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/09/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/26/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/05/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/05/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/22/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 10/22/2003