There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Military Survivor Benefits Improvement Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 10, United States Code, to increase the minimum Survivor Benefit Plan basic annuity for surviving spouses age 62 and older, to provide for a one-year open season under that plan, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/26/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
02/26/2003Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: Senate
02/26/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2842)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/12/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/12/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/12/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/12/2003
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/12/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/12/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/19/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/20/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/20/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/20/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/27/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/27/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/27/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/27/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/27/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/27/2003
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/01/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 04/01/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/07/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 04/07/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/07/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/08/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/11/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/29/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/29/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/06/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/22/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/03/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/10/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 06/12/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/12/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/19/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 06/19/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/19/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/19/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/24/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/09/2003
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 07/23/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/30/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/04/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/04/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/17/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/14/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 11/24/2003
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/31/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/29/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Armed Services02/26/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.451. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/26/2003)

Military Survivor Benefits Improvement Act of 2003 - Adjusts the basic Survivor Benefit Plan (SBP) annuity amount for surviving spouses, age 62 and older, of former military personnel to: (1) 35 percent of the retired pay of the decedent (current law), for months before October 2004; (2) 40 percent for months during FY 2005; (3) 45 percent for months during FY 2006; (4) 50 percent for months during FY 2007; and (5) 55 percent for months after FY 2007. Adjusts similarly percentage amounts with respect to survivors of reserve personnel and survivors of persons who die while on active duty. Provides a corresponding phased elimination of the SBP supplemental annuity authorized to be provided to such surviving spouses. Requires periodic recomputation of: (1) annuity amounts beginning in October 2004; and (2) retired pay reductions for supplemental survivor annuities.

Provides a one-year open enrollment period for SBP participation, commencing October 1, 2004, for those currently not participating, those electing to increase current coverage, and those wishing to participate in the supplemental SBP.

Authorizes the Secretary of Defense to require appropriate premiums for SBP participation.