Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/12/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/12/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/12/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/12/2003
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/12/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/12/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/19/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/20/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/20/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/20/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/27/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/27/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/27/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/27/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/27/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/27/2003
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/01/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 04/01/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/07/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 04/07/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/07/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/08/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/11/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/29/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/29/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/06/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/22/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/03/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/10/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 06/12/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/12/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/19/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/19/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/19/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/19/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/24/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/09/2003
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 07/23/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/30/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/04/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/04/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/17/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/14/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 11/24/2003
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/31/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/29/2004