Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/26/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/26/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 02/26/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 02/26/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/26/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/26/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/26/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 02/26/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 02/26/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/26/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/11/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/21/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/30/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/30/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 04/30/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 06/04/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/16/2003