Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/26/2003
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 02/26/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/26/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/26/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 02/26/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/26/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 02/26/2003
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/06/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/25/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/25/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/02/2003
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/03/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 04/30/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/14/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/04/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/24/2003