Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/27/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/07/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/03/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/29/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/15/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/21/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/04/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/21/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 10/22/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/06/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 11/11/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/04/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/19/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/29/2004